Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234887

EP3234887 - INTELLIGENT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PAYMENT, FINANCE, AND SOCIAL COMMERCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2018Supplementary search reportpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scintilla Quantum, LLC
3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500
Las Vegas, NV 89169 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BOCCARDI, Fabrizio
3960 Howard Hughes Parkway
Suite 500
Las Vegas, NV 89169 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Molnia, David
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15869423.218.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015IB02558
Priority number, dateUS201462094947P19.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462094947 P
US201562141255P31.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562141255 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016097876
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3234887
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/32
[2018/22]
Former International [2017/43]G06Q20/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR BEZAHLUNG, FINANZEN UND SOZIALEN HANDEL[2017/43]
English:INTELLIGENT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PAYMENT, FINANCE, AND SOCIAL COMMERCE[2017/43]
French:SYSTÈME INTELLIGENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PAIEMENT, DE FINANCEMENT ET DE COMMERCE SOCIAL[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2017National basic fee paid 
19.07.2017Search fee paid 
19.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
19.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2008208688  (BYERLEY DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Fig. 8, 11; para [0020], [0035], [0054], [0056], [0071], [0086], [0098], [0101] [0104], [0119], [0159] *;
 [A]US2013254004  (CERVENKA KAREN LOUISE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2005077349  (BONALLE DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire document *