Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234496

EP3234496 - WARHEAD FOR GENERATING A BLAST ON AN EXTENDED REGION OF A TARGET SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102 Haifa / IL
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TEPER, Yosef
C/o Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102 Haifa / IL
02 / NADAV, Tal
C/o Rafael advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102. Haifa / IL
03 / LEUS, Vitali
C/o Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102 Haifa / IL
 [2019/07]
Former [2017/43]01 / TEPER, Yosef
C/o Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102 Haifa / IL
02 / NADAV, Tal
C/o Rafael advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102. Haifa / IL
03 / LAOS, Vitali
C/o Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd.
P.O.B. 2250
3102102 Haifa / IL
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15869462.015.11.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015IL51097
Priority number, dateIL2014023630616.12.2014         Original published format: IL 23630614
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016098096
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234496
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3234496
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F42B5/145, F42B30/04, F42B12/46
[2017/49]
Former International [2017/43]F42B5/145, F42B30/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEFECHTSKOPF ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER EXPLOSION AUF EINER ERWEITERTEN REGION EINER ZIELFLÄCHE[2017/43]
English:WARHEAD FOR GENERATING A BLAST ON AN EXTENDED REGION OF A TARGET SURFACE[2017/43]
French:OGIVE POUR GÉNÉRER UNE EXPLOSION SUR UNE ZONE ÉTENDUE D'UNE SURFACE CIBLE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2017National basic fee paid 
26.05.2017Search fee paid 
26.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
26.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2018Fee for grant paid
03.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]NO17.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2001007229  (DALES STEPHEN PHILIP [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1-4 *
International search[A]US2001007229  (DALES STEPHEN PHILIP [GB]) [A] 1-16 * Entire document *;
 [A]US2012085259  (CRONEMBERGER PEDRO DE OLIVEIRA [BR]) [A] 1-16 * Figs 1-3 and 6 *;
 [A]US2007289475  (KAPELES JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-16 * Figs 3-4 *;
 [A]US2011252995  (DINDL FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * Abstract Figs 1-5 *;
 [A]US2013327571  (ANDRZEJAK TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1-16