Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235439

EP3235439 - ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXAMINATION REPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018Change - extension statespublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TAJIMA, Fumie
c/o HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL LTD.
6-22-1
Mure
Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP
02 / MITA, Yukihiro
c/o HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL LTD.
6-22-1
Mure
Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15869640.113.10.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015JP78937
Priority number, dateJP2014025529317.12.2014         Original published format: JP 2014255293
[2017/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016098432
Date:23.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235439
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/14, G06Q50/24
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSTISCHE ULTRASCHALLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES BEFUNDES[2017/43]
English:ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXAMINATION REPORT[2017/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC À ULTRASONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE RAPPORT D'EXAMEN[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2017Translation filed 
04.07.2017National basic fee paid 
04.07.2017Search fee paid 
04.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
22.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
20.02.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YA]JP2013109422  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , paragraphs [0015], [0030] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 3;
 [Y]JP2002314732  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , paragraph [0011] (Family: none) *