Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235660

EP3235660 - NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIDA, Masashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15869685.604.11.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015JP81094
Priority number, dateJP2014025494117.12.2014         Original published format: JP 2014254941
[2017/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016098477
Date:23.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235660
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60B9/04, B60C7/00, B60C7/14
[2018/16]
Former International [2017/43]B60B9/04, B60C7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:LUFTLOSER REIFEN[2017/43]
English:NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE[2017/43]
French:PNEU NON PNEUMATIQUE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2017Translation filed 
13.06.2017National basic fee paid 
13.06.2017Search fee paid 
13.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
13.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/48]
22.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008118983  (RESILIENT TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0096] - [0101] - [0103]; figures 1,25-28 *;
 [X]US2013240272  (GASS DONALD BRETT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 7,8 *;
 [X]JP2014080151  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * figures 1,5,6 *
International search[X]WO2014188912  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0017], [0024] to [0027], [0033] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *;
 [X]US6286572  (CHEN LING-LEA [TW]) [X] 1 * , column 1, line 56 to column 2, line 63; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [X]US2011248554  (CHON YOUNG-ILL [KR], et al) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0128] to [0136]; fig. 13 to 16 & KR 10-2009-0049982 A & CN 101909903 A *;
 [X]GB978913  (ROBERT BARNETT) [X] 1-2 * , entire text; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPH0325004  (UNIROYAL GOODRICH TIRE CO) [X] 1-2 * , page 6, upper left column, line 1 to page 13, upper left column, line 11; fig. 1 to 9 & EP 401564 A2 page 5, line 14 to page 10, line 22; fig. 1 to 9 *;
 [A]JPH0858307  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0008], [0021]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012196990  (CHUO HATSUJO KK, et al) [A] 1-2 * , paragraph [0058]; fig. 3 to 4 (Family: none) *