Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235564

EP3235564 - METHOD FOR PREPARING CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NOMURA, Yukiko
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1334 Minato
Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15870003.916.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015JP85175
Priority number, dateJP2014025584618.12.2014         Original published format: JP 2014255846
[2017/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016098801
Date:23.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235564
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/644, B01J37/02, B01J37/04, B01J37/18, C07C51/235, C07C59/125, C07B61/00, B01J37/03, B01J21/18, B01J35/00, B01J37/00
[2018/30]
Former International [2017/43]B01J23/644, B01J37/02, B01J37/04, B01J37/18, C07C51/235, C07C59/125, C07B61/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS[2017/43]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING CATALYST[2017/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA PRÉPARATION DE CATALYSEUR[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2017Translation filed 
24.05.2017National basic fee paid 
24.05.2017Search fee paid 
24.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
24.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH11279110  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1,3-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015]; examples reference, -; claim - * [I] 2,8,9;
 [XI]US2007100161  (EBNER JERRY R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10-15 * paragraph [0020]; example 13; claim - * [I] 2,8,9;
 [XI]US2014088323  (SAKAGUCHI AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0040] - [0048]; example -; claim - * [I] 2,8,9;
 [A]US4845208  (FUERTES PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012296115  (SHIRASAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]JPH11279110  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1, 3; paragraphs [0010], [0011]; referential examples; examples 1, 4, 6 to 10, 12, 13 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2002504427  (Monsanto Co.) [A] 1-16 * , example 13 & US 6337298 B1 example 13 & WO 1999/043430 A1 & CN 1298322 A & CA 2610653 A1 *;
 [A]JPH07173099  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1, 2; example 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0272137  (DEGUSSA) [A] 1-16 * , claim 1; examples 1 to 5 & US 5132452 A claims 1, 2; examples 1 to 5 & EP 0350741 A1 & DE 3823301 C1 *;
 [A]JPH04305538  (AG TECHNOLOGY KK) [A] 1-16 * , claim 1; example 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH10158227  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1, 4, 6; paragraph [0009]; example 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH09512286  (Rhone-Poulenc Chimie) [A] 1-16 * , example 1 & US 5756853 A example 1 & WO 1996/026175 A1 & FR 2730730 A1 *;
 [A]WO2012169585  (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0028] to [0031]; examples 1 to 12 & US 2014/0088323 A1 claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0040] to [0048]; examples 1 to 12 & EP 2719678 A1 & JP 2013-014581 A & JP 2013-107868 A *;
 [A]JP2012000595  (ICT KK, et al) [A] 1-16 * , claim 1; example 1; comparative example 2; fig. 2 (Family: none) *