Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234010

EP3234010 - RUBBER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING WHEY PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
535 Marriott Drive
Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / GALIZIO, Benjamin C.
7440 Sylvan Drive
Kent, Ohio 44240 / US
02 / RANDALL, Amy M.
2136 Sand Run Knolls Dr.
Akron, Ohio 44313 / US
03 / CLARK, Melissa M.
551 Taopi Circle
Woodland Park, Colorado 80863 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15870497.311.06.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US35264
Priority number, dateUS201462093596P18.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462093596 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016099599
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234010
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/22, C08K3/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/04
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MOLKEPROTEIN[2017/43]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING WHEY PROTEIN[2017/43]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE CAOUTCHOUC CONTENANT UNE PROTÉINE DE LACTOSÉRUM[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2017National basic fee paid 
19.06.2017Search fee paid 
19.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
19.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.10.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003135006  (MATERNE, T. F. E. et al.) [A] 1-5, 13-15 * See Examples I-II; paragraphs [0045], [0059], [0060], [0124], [0130], [0138]; Tables 1, 3; and claims 1-2. *;
 [A]US2012183794  (GUO, M. et al.) [A] 1-5, 13-15 * See Examples 4-7; and paragraphs [0166], [0169], [0175]-[0177], [0180]. *;
 [A]US2013263520  (HOUGA, C. et al.) [A] 1-5, 13-15 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0033]; and claims 23-27. *;
 [A]US2009232876  (MONTES, J. G. et al.) [A] 1-5, 13-15 * See claims 1-11. *
 [A]  - HAN, X.-Q. et al., "Thermodynamic compatibility of substrate proteins affects their cross-linking by transglutaminase.", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (19960000), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 1211 - 1217 [A] 1-5, 13-15 * See Abstract; Results and Discussion. *