Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3238628

EP3238628 - LIFTING APPARATUS FOR PRESSURE PADDLE AND X-RAY IMAGE PHOTOGRAPHING DEVICE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rayence Co., Ltd.
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd.
14
Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / NOH, Byoung Soo
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date15873671.024.12.2015
[2017/44]
WO2015KR14234
Priority number, dateKR2014019061626.12.2014         Original published format: KR 20140190616
[2017/44]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016105144
Date:30.06.2016
Language:KO
[2016/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3238628
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/04, A61B6/00
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
TitleGerman:HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KOMPRESSIONSPADDLE UND RÖNTGENBILDFOTOGRAFIEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2017/44]
English:LIFTING APPARATUS FOR PRESSURE PADDLE AND X-RAY IMAGE PHOTOGRAPHING DEVICE INCLUDING SAME[2017/44]
French:APPAREIL DE LEVAGE POUR PALETTE DE PRESSION ET DISPOSITIF DE PHOTOGRAPHIE D'IMAGE RADIOGRAPHIQUE LE COMPRENANT[2017/44]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2017Translation filed 
19.07.2017National basic fee paid 
19.07.2017Search fee paid 
19.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
12.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4658409  (SUMM HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10,13 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 59; figures 1,2 * [I] 3-8,11,12,14,15;
 [A]CN103876760  (SHENYANG NEUSOFT MEDICAL SYS) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP2740406  (RAYENCE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [A]US2013251112  (TAKU MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1,9-14 * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0142] *
International search[YA]CN103876760  (SHENYANG NEUSOFT MEDICAL SYS) [Y] 1, 2, 9, 10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0037], [0057]-[0091] and figures 1-5 * [A] 3-8, 11, 12;
 [Y]KR101377127B  (RAYENCE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1, 2, 9, 10 * See abstract, paragraph [0043] and figure 5. *;
 [A]JP2010179030  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-12 * See abstract, paragraphs [0014]-[0027] and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]JP2009142301  (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-12 * See abstract paragraphs [0018]-[0025] and figures 1, 2. *;
 [A]US5526394  (SICZEK BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See abstract, claims 1-16 and figures 2, 3. *