Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3242494

EP3242494 - NFC-BASED COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Change - French titlepublished on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Unionpay Co., Ltd.
CUP Tower
36 Hanxiao Road
Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN
[2017/45]
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Wei
7th Floor CUP Tower
36 Hanxiao Rd.
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200135 / CN
02 / LI, Dingzhou
7th Floor CUP Tower
36 Hanxiao Rd.
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200135 / CN
03 / ZHOU, Yu
7th Floor CUP Tower
36 Hanxiao Rd.
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200135 / CN
 [2017/45]
Representative(s)Schneider, Sascha , et al
Becker & Müller
Patentanwälte
Turmstraße 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[2017/45]
Application number, filing date15875059.608.12.2015
[2017/45]
WO2015CN96706
Priority number, dateCN20141083095829.12.2014         Original published format: CN201410830958
[2017/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016107381
Date:07.07.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3242494
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00, G06F21/74, H04W4/80, G06F21/53, H04W8/00, H04W76/14
[2018/29]
Former International [2017/45]H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG AUF NFC-BASIS UND -VERFAHREN[2017/45]
English:NFC-BASED COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD[2017/45]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION BASÉ SUR NFC[2020/13]
Former [2017/45]DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION BASÉ SUR CCP
Entry into regional phase22.06.2017Translation filed 
22.06.2017National basic fee paid 
22.06.2017Search fee paid 
22.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
22.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008155257  (WERNER JEREMY ISAAC NATHANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * pages 27-62 * [I] 3-5,8-10;
 [A]US8712407  (COPE WARREN B [US], et al) [A] 3,8 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 29 *;
 [A]WO2014202200  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 4,9 * page 9, lines 15-30; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2014256252  (GESLIN JEREMY [FR], et al) [A] 5,10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033] *
International search[XA]US2008155257  (WERNER JEREMY ISAAC NATHANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 5-7, 10 * , abstract, description, paragraphs [0003] and [0030]-[0037], and figure 2, abstract, description, paragraphs [0003] and [0030]-[0037], and figure 2 * [A] 3-4, 8-9;
 [A]CN103745155  (EASTCOMPEACE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103544599  (MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *