Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3101418

EP3101418 - GAS ANALYZING APPARATUS COMPRISING A TEMPERATURE CONTROLLING SYSTEM FOR THE CAPILLARY SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/49]GAS PHASE SUBSTANCE ANALYSIS APPARATUS AND GAS PHASE IMPORTING APPARATUS
[2019/14]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Floor, Block A
TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
[2019/40]
Former [2016/49]For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Fl. Block A Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Hadian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Qingjun
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
02 / LI, Yuanjing
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
03 / CHEN, Zhiqiang
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
04 / ZHAO, Ziran
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
05 / LIU, Yinong
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
06 / LIU, Yaohong
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
07 / MA, Qiufeng
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
08 / HE, Huishao
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
09 / ZHU, Weiping
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
10 / ZOU, Xiang
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
11 / CHANG, Jianping
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
12 / LIANG, Song
2nd Floor
Block A
Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
 [2016/49]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/49]
Application number, filing date15875162.824.12.2015
[2016/49]
WO2015CN98665
Priority number, dateCN20141085571531.12.2014         Original published format: CN201410855715
[2016/49]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016107484
Date:07.07.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3101418
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3101418
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N30/30, G01N30/46, G01N27/62
[2017/31]
Former International [2016/49]G01N30/30, G01N30/46, G01N27/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GASPHASENSUBSTANZANALYSEVORRICHTUNG BEINHALTEND EINE TEMPERATURKONTROLLEINHEIT FÜR DIE KAPILLARFÖRMIGE GASENTNAHMEEINHEIT[2019/14]
English:GAS ANALYZING APPARATUS COMPRISING A TEMPERATURE CONTROLLING SYSTEM FOR THE CAPILLARY SAMPLING DEVICE[2019/14]
French:APPAREIL D'ANALYSE DE SUBSTANCE EN PHASE GAZEUSE AVEC UNE UNITÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE POUR LE DISPOSITIF DE PRÉLÈVEMENT CAPILLAIRE[2019/14]
Former [2016/49]GASPHASENSUBSTANZANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND GASPHASENIMPORTVORRICHTUNG
Former [2016/49]GAS PHASE SUBSTANCE ANALYSIS APPARATUS AND GAS PHASE IMPORTING APPARATUS
Former [2016/49]APPAREIL D'ANALYSE DE SUBSTANCE EN PHASE GAZEUSE ET APPAREIL D'IMPORTATION DE PHASE GAZEUSE
Entry into regional phase21.07.2016Translation filed 
21.07.2016National basic fee paid 
21.07.2016Search fee paid 
21.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/49]
21.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2019Fee for grant paid
22.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN203798779U  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [X] 1,11,14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0012] * [I] 7;
 [XYI]EP0891543  (MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 3, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 4,7-13 [I] 2,3;
 [Y]US2007029477  (MILLER RAANAN A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 14A * * paragraph [0185] *;
 [Y]US2007256474  (PAAKKANEN HEIKKI [FI], et al) [Y] 7 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] *;
 [Y]US5228514  (WORDEN RAYMOND D [US], et al) [Y] 8-13 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 46 *
International search[XY]CN203798779U  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [X] 1, 5-7, 11, 13, 14 * , abstract, description, pages 2-6, and figures 1 and 2, abstract, description, pages 2-6, and figures 1 and 2 * [Y] 2-4, 8-10, 12, 15;
 [Y]US5808178  (ROUNBEHLER DAVID P [US], et al) [Y] 8-10, 12, 15 * , abstract, figures 1, 4 and 27, and description, columns 1-5, 14, 15 and 22-24 *;
 [Y]CN101382526  (DALIAN INST CHEM & PHYSICS [CN]) [Y] 8, 12 * , abstract, description, page 4, and figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2010089811  (ZELECHONOK YURY [US], et al) [Y] 15 * , figures 1 and 4, and description, page 2 *;
 [XY]CN1296564  (LAWRENCE V HALEY [CA]) [X] 1, 5-7, 11, 13, 14 * , description, pages 2-7, and figures 2 and 3, description, pages 2-7, and figures 2 and 3 * [Y] 2-4, 8-10, 12, 15;
 [A]CN1910453  (ENVIRONICS OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN201917559U  (DALIAN CHEMICAL PHYSICS INST) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN104020237  (WUHAN SYSCAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6479652  (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2013009053  (WU CHING [US]) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2013180405  (CURRIE RON W [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [PX]CN104515824  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims, description, pages 2-6, and figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]CN204389459U  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims, description, pages 2-6, and figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]CN204424206U  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims, description, pages 15-18, and figures 1 and 9-12 *;
 [PX]CN104749264  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [PX] 1, 11, 14 * , abstract, description, pages 5 and 6, and figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]  - SIELEMANN, S. et al., "Detection of Trans-1, 2-Dichloroethene, Trichloroethene and Tetrachloroethene Using Multi-Capillary Columns Coupled to Ion Mobility Spectrometers with UV-Ionisation Sources", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETRY, (19991231), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 15 - 21, XP008182776 [Y] 2-4
ExaminationUS6333088
 US2010089811
 EP3242316