Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3101418 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3101418



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 302
14.10.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 3
18.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
18.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
18.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
28.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.01.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
28.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
28.01.2019 Description Search / examination 2
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.07.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.03.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.03.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.02.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.08.2017 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
18.07.2017 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
06.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 8
06.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 10
06.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
26.07.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
21.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.07.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
21.07.2016 Description Search / examination 17
21.07.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Drawings Search / examination 3
21.07.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 3
21.07.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 10
21.07.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.07.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.07.2016 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 4
07.07.2016 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 18