Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3243874

EP3243874 - RUBBER COMPOSITION INCLUDING CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER AND OLEFIN POLYMER AND TIRE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTANI, Kyohei
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/46]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/46]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15877102.228.12.2015
[2017/46]
WO2015JP86519
Priority number, dateJP2015000368009.01.2015         Original published format: JP 2015003680
[2017/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016111230
Date:14.07.2016
Language:JA
[2016/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3243874
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L21/00, B60C1/00, C08L23/00, C08L9/00, C08K5/14, C08K5/23, C08K5/36, C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C08L23/12, G01Q60/32
[2017/47]
Former International [2017/46]C08L21/00, B60C1/00, C08L23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/46]
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG MIT KONJUGIERTEM DIENPOLYMER UND OLEFINPOLYMER UND REIFEN DAMIT[2017/46]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION INCLUDING CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER AND OLEFIN POLYMER AND TIRE USING SAME[2017/46]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC CONTENANT UN POLYMÈRE À BASE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ ET UN POLYMÈRE À BASE D'OLÉFINE, ET PNEUMATIQUE METTANT EN UVRE CELLE-CI[2017/46]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2017Translation filed 
27.06.2017National basic fee paid 
27.06.2017Search fee paid 
27.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/46]
27.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/49]
30.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2703439  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2006276613  (YILGOR ISKENDER [TR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] - [0081] - [0082] - [0096] - [0098] - [0111] - [0116]; figures 1-14; claims 1,8 *;
 [A]US2008050572  (GUERRET OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0074] - [0084]; figure 1; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]US2010168338  (GUERRET OLIVIER [FR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0188] , [0198]; figures 1-3; examples 3,4 *;
 [A]WO2013184517  (SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLAST [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 30, lines 6-23; figure 4; claims 1-3 *
International search[X]JP2006348222  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-11 * , claims; paragraphs [0041] to [0043]; example 5 (Family: none) *;
 [X]WO2012023607  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * , claims; paragraph [0030]; examples 1 to 8; comparative examples 2, 3, 5 to 7 & US 2013/0150512 A1 claims; paragraphs [0049] to [0050]; examples 1 to 8; comparative examples 2, 3, 5 to 7 & WO 2012/023607 A1 & DE 112011102762 T & CN 103068897 A *;
 [X]JP2013116670  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2013067676  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2005272720  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2001114837  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-11 * , claims; paragraph [0118]; examples & US 6787623 B1 & EP 1217015 A1 claims; paragraph [0140]; examples & DE 60024652 D & CN 1327454 A *;
 [X]WO2014105488  (BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE [US]) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 2015/0344679 A1 & CN 104903398 A & JP 2016/504464 A *;
 [X]JPS62292847  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-11 * , claims; industrial field of application; examples (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPS62297345  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 4801641 A claims; examples & US 4886850 A *;
 [X]US2009115108  (RODGERS MICHAEL B [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *