Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233797

EP3233797 - MAP4K4 (HGK) INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/43]MAP4K4 (HGK) Inhibitors
[2018/50]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2018New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRI International Inc.
333 Ravenswood Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / JONG, Ling
SRI International
333 Ravenswood Ave
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
02 / CHANG, Chih-Tsung
SRI International
333 Ravenswood Ave
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
03 / PARK, Jaehyeon
SRI International
333 Ravenswood Ave
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Zwicker, Jörk
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15878248.219.06.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US36816
Priority number, dateUS201562104764P18.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562104764 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016114816
Date:21.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233797
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/08, C07D209/14, C07D209/30, C07D403/06, C07D405/06, C07D471/04, A61K31/404, A61K31/416, A61K31/4184, A61K31/4192, A61K31/437, A61P35/00
[2017/47]
Former International [2017/43]C07D209/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:MAP4K4 (HGK)-INHIBITOREN[2017/43]
English:MAP4K4 (HGK) INHIBITORS[2018/50]
French:INHIBITEURS DE MAP4K4 (HGK)[2017/43]
Former [2017/43]MAP4K4 (HGK) Inhibitors
Entry into regional phase17.07.2017National basic fee paid 
17.07.2017Search fee paid 
17.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
17.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013113669  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * see abstract and claim 10 *;
 [A]WO2008079903  (PLEXXIKON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * see paparagraphs [0115]-[0121] and claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1065204  (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * in particular example 14 and table on page 30, entry 14 *;
 [A]  - GUAN QI ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of benzimidazole carbamates bearing indole moieties for antiproliferative and antitubulin activities", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (20140928), vol. 87, doi:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2014.09.071, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 306 - 315, XP029019083 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * see scheme 1, abstract and pararaph 2.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2014.09.071
International search[A]US2009142832  (DALTON JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * entire document *
 [X]  - PUBCHEM., (20141020), Database accession no. 217988847. [X] 1 * . entire document *
 [A]  - TELLER et al., "Bis(1H-2-indolyl)-1-methanones as inhibitors of the hematopoietic tyrosine kinase Flt3.", Leukemia, vol. 16, (20020000), pages 1528 - 1534, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/profile/Joachim_Schwaeble/publication/11236303_Bis (1H-2-indolyl)-1-methanones_as_inhibitors_of_the_hematopoietic_tyrosinekinase_Flt3/links/54 0977e90cf2187a6a6ec736.pdf, (20150820), XP055399763 [A] 1-9 * . entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.leu.2402630
 [A]  - BECKERS et al., CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 62, (20020000), pages 3113 - 3119, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/profile/Joachim-Schwaeble/publication/11236303_Bis (1H-2-indolyl)-1-methanones_as_inhibitors_of_the_hematopoietic_tyrosine_kinase-Flt3/links/54 0977e90cf2187a6a6ec736.pdf, (20150820), XP002267118 [A] 1-9 * . entire document *