Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3251875

EP3251875 - PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/49]
Inventor(s)01 / OSHIMA, Masatomo
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/49]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/49]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15879840.521.12.2015
[2017/49]
WO2015JP06363
Priority number, dateJP2015001729730.01.2015         Original published format: JP 2015017297
[2017/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016120941
Date:04.08.2016
Language:JA
[2016/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3251875
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3251875
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.08.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/22, B60C3/04, B60C9/20
[2018/29]
Former International [2017/49]B60C9/18, B60C9/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN FÜR EIN MOTORRAD[2017/49]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR MOTORCYCLE[2017/49]
French:PNEUMATIQUE POUR MOTOCYCLE[2017/49]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2017Translation filed 
16.06.2017National basic fee paid 
16.06.2017Search fee paid 
16.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/49]
16.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2018Fee for grant paid
15.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0453294  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 25; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO2010073055  (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3; claim 5 *;
 [A]JP2003260906  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0063]; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0549311  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2012513334  (Pirelli Tyres S.p.A.) [A] 1-2 * , & US 2011/0315294 A1 & EP 2376296 A1 & CN 102264554 A & BR 0823305 A2 *;
 [A]JP2005053478  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) [A] 1-2 * , & US 2005/0022917 A1 & GB 2404636 A & EP 1502770 A1 & DE 602004012929 T2 & ES 2306959 T3 *;
 [A]JP2012131184  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-2 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006199074  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-2 * , (Family: none) *