Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3255394

EP3255394 - COMBINATION WEIGHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ishida Co., Ltd.
44, Sanno-cho
Shogoin
Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 606-8392 / JP
[2017/50]
Inventor(s)01 / KISHIKAWA Mikio
c/o Shiga Integrated Facility
Ishida Co. Ltd.
959-1 Shimomagari
Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP
 [2017/50]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/50]
Application number, filing date15881224.821.12.2015
[2017/50]
WO2015JP85684
Priority number, dateJP2015002007304.02.2015         Original published format: JP 2015020073
[2017/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016125407
Date:11.08.2016
Language:JA
[2016/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3255394
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.08.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01G19/387, G01G19/393, G01G13/24
[2018/36]
Former International [2017/50]G01G19/387
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSWIEGEVORRICHTUNG[2017/50]
English:COMBINATION WEIGHING DEVICE[2017/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PESAGE COMBINÉ[2017/50]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2017Translation filed 
04.09.2017National basic fee paid 
04.09.2017Search fee paid 
04.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/50]
04.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0076093  (ISHIDA SCALE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - page 1, line 14 * * page 2, line 6 - page 2, line 14 *
International search[YA]JP2009092399  (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0012], [0026] to [0029], [0035] to [0062]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 4;
 [YA]JPS62140418U  (Anritsu Corp.) [Y] 1-3 * , specification, page 2, line 17 to page 8, line 11; page 9, line 17 to page 11, line 10; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 4;
 [A]JP2008026250  (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0010], [0020], [0027] to [0081]; fig. 1 to 10 (Family: none) *