Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3253309

EP3253309 - USE OF ABSORPTION MATERIAL TO REDUCE RADIO FREQUENCY-INDUCED HEATING IN EXTERNAL FIXATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chen, Ji
4734 Burclare Court
Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US
[2017/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/50]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2017/50]
Application number, filing date15881384.030.09.2015
[2017/50]
WO2015US53319
Priority number, dateUS201562113271P06.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562113271 P
[2017/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016126288
Date:11.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3253309
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.10.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/60, A61B17/64, A61B17/86
[2017/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ABSORBTIONSMATERIAL ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER FUNKFREQUENZINDUZIERTEN ERWÄRMUNG EXTERNER FIXIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN[2017/50]
English:USE OF ABSORPTION MATERIAL TO REDUCE RADIO FREQUENCY-INDUCED HEATING IN EXTERNAL FIXATION DEVICES[2017/50]
French:UTILISATION DE MATÉRIAU D'ABSORPTION POUR RÉDUIRE LE CHAUFFAGE INDUIT PAR RADIO-FRÉQUENCE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS DE FIXATION EXTERNES[2017/50]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2017National basic fee paid 
24.08.2017Search fee paid 
24.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/50]
24.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
03.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014275959  (DISEGI JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,16 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037]; figures 1-3B *;
 [I]US2005085810  (LUTZ CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO03094769  (ELEKTA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HUANG XIN ET AL, "MRI heating reduction for external fixation devices using absorption material", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY (EMC), IEEE, doi:10.1109/ISEMC.2014.6898953, ISBN 978-1-4799-5544-2, (20140804), pages 113 - 117, (20140915), XP032686669 [X] 1-16 * pages 113-116; figures 1,3,7,8,10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISEMC.2014.6898953
International search[XY]US2005085810  (LUTZ CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1-4, 5/1-4 * ; figures 1-3; paragraphs [0009], [0023], [0025], [0028] * [Y] 12-15, 16/12-15;
 [XY]  - HUANG, X et al., "MRI heating reduction for external fixation devices using absorption material.", 2014 IEEE International Symposium on Electromagnetic Compatibility (EMC)., (20140804), pages 113 - 117, URL: http://mrisafetymodeling.com/pub/P2_2014_IEEE-EMC.pdf>;, XP032686669 [X] 1-3, 12-14 * ; figures 1, 3(c), 10, 11; pages 116, 117 * [Y] 12-15, 16/12-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISEMC.2014.6898953
 [A]  - LIU, Y et al., "Effect of insulating layer material on RF-induced heating for external fixation system in 1.5 T MRI system.", Electromagnetic Biology and Medicine., (20140000), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 223 - 227, XP055462972 [A] 1-3, 12-14 * ; entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/15368378.2013.802244
 [A]  - LIU, Y et al., "Numerical investigations of MRI RF field induced heating for external fixation devices.", BioMedical Engineering OnLine ., (20130000), vol. 12, no. 12, XP021141844 [A] 1-3, 12-14 * ; entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-925X-12-12