Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3272290

EP3272290 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECONSTRUCTING MEDICAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vatech Co., Ltd.
13, Samseong 1-ro 2 gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd.
14, Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / IM, Se Yeol
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gi
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
02 / KIM, Tae Woo
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gi
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
03 / SEO, Dong Wan
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gi
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
04 / CHOI, Sung Il
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gi
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
05 / HAN, Tae Hee
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gi
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/04]
Application number, filing date15885652.624.07.2015
[2018/04]
WO2015KR07733
Priority number, dateKR2015003765218.03.2015         Original published format: KR 20150037652
[2018/04]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016148350
Date:22.09.2016
Language:KO
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3272290
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/00, A61B8/13, A61B8/08, G06T5/00, G06T5/50
[2018/49]
Former International [2018/04]A61B8/00, A61B8/13, A61B8/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REKONSTRUKTION EINES MEDIZINISCHEN BILDES[2018/04]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECONSTRUCTING MEDICAL IMAGE[2018/04]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGES MÉDICALES[2018/04]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2017Translation filed 
17.10.2017National basic fee paid 
17.10.2017Search fee paid 
17.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
17.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - FARMAN ET AL, "Development of imaging selection criteria and procedures should precede cephalometric assessment with cone-beam computed tomography", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF ORTHODONTICS AND DENTOFACIAL ORTHOPE, MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20060801), vol. 130, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.AJODO.2005.10.021, ISSN 0889-5406, pages 257 - 265, XP005592973 [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,12 * abstract * * page 258, column R * * page 259, column L * * figure 2 * [I] 3,4,6,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajodo.2005.10.021
 [A]  - V KUMAR, "Comparison of conventional and cone beam CT synthesized cephalograms", MASTER THESIS, (20070101), no. 5, pages 1 - 69, XP055513567 [A] 4,10 * abstract * * figure 1 *
International search[YA]US2015036790  (ZOCCATELLI GIACOMO [IT]) [Y] 1, 2, 5-8, 11 * See abstract, paragraphs [0040], [0060]-[0068], claim 1 and figures 1, 2. * [A] 3, 4, 9, 10, 12-14;
 [Y]JP2007130240  (IMAGUNOOSHISU KK) [Y] 1, 2, 5-8, 11 * See abstract, paragraphs [0022]-[0034] and figures 1-9. *;
 [A]US2013235036  (FUKUI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * See abstract, paragraphs [0080]-[0092], claims 1-3 and figures 4A-10. *;
 [A]US2013022252  (CHEN SHOUPU [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See abstract, paragraphs [0034]-[0038] and figures 1, 3B. *;
 [A]KR20100070822  (VATECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See abstract, paragraphs [0030]-[0041], claims 1-4 and figures 1-3. *