Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3275625

EP3275625 - SADDLE CURVED-SURFACE TRANSITION-BASED STEPLESS BIDIRECTIONAL STRETCHING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
South China University of Technology
No. 381 Wushan Road
Tianhe
Guangzhou, Guangdong 510640 / CN
For all designated states
Guangzhou Huaxinke Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd.
19 Shenzhou Road, Science Town
Guangzhou
Guangdong 510663 / CN
[2018/05]
Inventor(s)01 / QU, Jinping
No. 381 Wushan Road
Tianhe District
Guangzhou Guangdong 510640 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Guizhen
No. 381 Wushan Road
Tianhe District
Guangzhou Guangdong 510640 / CN
 [2018/05]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/05]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15886144.329.12.2015
[2018/05]
WO2015CN99635
Priority number, dateCN20151013440325.03.2015         Original published format: CN201510134403
[2018/05]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016150222
Date:29.09.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3275625
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29C55/16
[2018/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/05]
TitleGerman:AUF ÜBERGANG EINER SATTELFÖRMIGEN GEKRÜMMTEN OBERFLÄCHE BASIERENDES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR STUFENLOSES BIDIREKTIONALES DEHNEN VON FOLIEN[2018/05]
English:SADDLE CURVED-SURFACE TRANSITION-BASED STEPLESS BIDIRECTIONAL STRETCHING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILM[2018/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉTIRAGE BIDIRECTIONNEL À VARIATION CONTINUE À BASE DE TRANSITION DE SURFACE INCURVÉE EN FORME DE SELLE POUR FILM[2018/05]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2017Translation filed 
19.09.2017National basic fee paid 
19.09.2017Search fee paid 
19.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/05]
19.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2702406  (GLENN REED EXA) [X] 1 * figures 2,11,12,14-16,18-21 * [I] 2-7;
 [XA]US3833973  (SCHWARZ E) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-7
International search[Y]US3138824  (BROWN JR WILLIAM H, et al) [Y] 2-7 * , description, column 3, lines 9-52, and figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]CN102717511  (GUANGZHOU HUAXINKE IND CO LTD, et al) [Y] 2-7 * , description, page 3, lines 2-3 *;
 [PX]CN204585815U  (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH, et al) [PX] 1-7 * , claims 1-6, and description, paragraph [0015] *;
 [PX]CN104723546  (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH, et al) [PX] 1-7 * , claims 1-7 *;
 [A]CN203697467U  (NINGBO FUNASI FLUORINE MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , the whole document *