EP3289559 - JOURNEY AND CHARGE PRESENTATIONS AT MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ent. Services Development Corporation LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCORRY, Kieran 41 Osborne Park Malone Road Belfast Antrim BT9 6JP / GB | 02 /
WILSON, Garry Barnhall Road Liffey Park Technology Campus Leixlip Co Kildare / IE | 03 /
CURRAN, Enda Ballybrit Business Park Galway / IE | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15890953.1 | 30.04.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015US28439 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175821 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289559 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/14, G06Q20/14, H04W4/02, G06Q20/32 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
G01C21/34 (US);
G06Q20/145 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (US);
G06Q20/3224 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3274 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (US);
G06Q20/407 (US);
G06Q30/0284 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q2240/00 (EP,US);
G07B15/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | G06Q50/14, G06Q20/14, H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | REISE- UND BERECHNUNGSPRÄSENTATIONEN AUF MOBILEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/10] | English: | JOURNEY AND CHARGE PRESENTATIONS AT MOBILE DEVICES | [2018/10] | French: | PRÉSENTATIONS DE PARCOURS ET DE FRAIS AU NIVEAU DE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.04.2021 | 20.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/44] | 27.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004051580 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,9,12,14 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - line 26 * * page 9, line 3 - line 9 * * page 11, line 5 - line 33 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 6 * [I] 2,3,7,10,11,13,15; | [A]US2011060600 (FOX ARIEH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0022] , [0024] , [0030] , [0037] *; | [A]US2012101942 (PARK KI HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] , [0043] , [0097] * | International search | [Y]WO03071489 (SITRA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See abstract, page 1, lines 1-4, page 10, lines 3-6 and claims 1,5,45. *; | [A]US2009312947 (BRANDIS JR EDWARD H [US]) [A] 1-15* See abstract and claims 1,2,7-11,13-17. *; | [Y]US2010088026 (MANOLESCU DRAGOS A [US]) [Y] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0019],[0024],[0031],[0035],[0039] and claims 1,5-7, 10. *; | [A]US2013173316 (AGRAWAL RAJESH [US]) [A] 1-15 * See abstract and claims 1-5,9-11. *; | [A]US2013268304 (DOSHI KALPESH ASHOK [US]) [A] 1-15 * See abstract and claims 21-27. *; | [Y]US2015006072 (GOLDBERG JEREMY KASILE [US], et al) [Y] 13 * See abstract and claims 1,3. * |