Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3295895

EP3295895 - COMBINED MODEL SCANNING AND ORAL CAVITY SCANNING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vatech Co., Ltd.
13, Samseong 1-ro 2 gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd.
14, Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
[2018/12]
Inventor(s)01 / MOON, An O
111-dong 1703-ho, 177
Anyangcheonseo-ro
Manan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do, 14038 / KR
02 / KIM, Yeong Kyun
1122-cong 201-ho, 303-14
Dongtancheonggye-ro
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do, 14038 / KR
 [2018/23]
Former [2018/12]01 / MOON, An O
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
02 / KIM, Yeong Kyun
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/12]
Application number, filing date15891925.820.05.2015
[2018/12]
WO2015KR05037
Priority number, dateKR2015006454408.05.2015         Original published format: KR 20150064544
[2018/12]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016182109
Date:17.11.2016
Language:KO
[2016/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3295895
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61C9/00
[2018/52]
Former International [2018/12]A61C13/34, A61C13/38, A61C19/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTE MODELLABTASTUNGS- UND MUNDHÖHLENABTASTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/12]
English:COMBINED MODEL SCANNING AND ORAL CAVITY SCANNING APPARATUS[2018/12]
French:APPAREIL COMBINÉ DE BALAYAGE DE MODÈLE ET DE BALAYAGE DE CAVITÉ BUCCALE[2018/12]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2017Translation filed 
19.05.2017National basic fee paid 
19.05.2017Search fee paid 
19.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.05.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
19.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2015018613  (HOLLENBECK KARL-JOSEF [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 74] , [ 187]; figure 1 * [A] 5-7 [I] 3,9;
 [XAI]US2014022356  (FISKER RUNE [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 205] , [0208]; figure 1, * [A] 5-7 [I] 3,9;
 [XAI]US2014248576  (TCHOUPRAKOV ANDREI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 28]; figures 4, 6, 9 * [A] 5-7 [I] 3,9
International search[XY]US2008199829  (PALEY ERIC B [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-5 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0032]; figure 1. * [Y] 2-3;
 [Y]KR200466356Y  (THEO DENTAL) [Y] 2-3 * See claim 11; paragraph [0047]; figures 4-5. *;
 [A]KR20110097566  (ZEHNER MEEL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR101108627B  (YI, Tae - Kyoung) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]JP2004344262  (J MORITA TOKYO MFG CORP) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. *