Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3202890

EP3202890 - NOVEL INDIGENOUS NATURAL LACTOBACILLUS FOR BAKING BREAD ISOLATED FROM TRADITIONAL KOREAN MALT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPC Co., Ltd.
18 Sagimakgol-ro 31beon-gil
Jungwon-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13220 / KR
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Chung Kil
103-1602
8 Dogok-ro 28-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06272 / KR
02 / LEE, Cheon Yong
412-205
201 Sunae-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13581 / KR
03 / SHIM, Sang Min
116-1401
33 Imgok-ro 80beon-gil
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13916 / KR
04 / JUNG, Moon Young
204 3 Cheongnyong 5-gil
Gwanak-gu
Seoul 08786 / KR
05 / SONG, Seong Bong
1-305
15 Nonhyeon-ro 34-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06296 / KR
06 / KIM, Byeong Cheol
121-1001 9 Jangseungbaegi-ro 4-gil
Dongjak-gu Seoul 06966 / KR
07 / SEO, Jin Ho
101-903
239 Bangbae-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06557 / KR
08 / HAN, Nam Soo
1204-1703, 19, Bodeum 4-ro
Sejong-si, 30098 / KR
09 / HONG, Sung Jong
14, Sindaebang 16da-gil, Dongjak-gu
Seoul 07068 / KR
 [2018/16]
Former [2018/11]01 / PARK, Chung Kil
103-1602
8 Dogok-ro 28-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06272 / KR
02 / LEE, Cheon Yong
412-205
201 Sunae-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13581 / KR
03 / SHIM, Sang Min
116-1401
33 Imgok-ro 80beon-gil
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13916 / KR
04 / JUNG, Moon Young
204 3 Cheongnyong 5-gil
Gwanak-gu
Seoul 08786 / KR
05 / SONG, Seong Bong
1-305
15 Nonhyeon-ro 34-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06296 / KR
06 / KIM, Byeong Cheol
121-1001 9 Jangseungbaegi-ro 4-gil
Dongjak-gu Seoul 06966 / KR
07 / SEO, Jin Ho
101-903
239 Bangbae-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06557 / KR
08 / HAN, Nam Soo
804-1503
56 Pungnyeon-ro
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28410 / KR
09 / HONG, Sung Jong
51-10 Nowon-ro 15-gil
Nowon-gu
Seoul 01790 / KR
Former [2017/32]01 / PARK, Chung Kil
103-1602
8 Dogok-ro 28-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06272 / KR
02 / LEE, Cheon Yong
412-205
201 Sunae-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13581 / KR
03 / SHIM, Sang Min
116-1401
33 Imgok-ro 80beon-gil
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13916 / KR
04 / JUNG, Moon Young
204 3 Cheongnyong 5-gil
Gwanak-gu
Seoul 08786 / KR
05 / SONG, Seong Bong
1-305
15 Nonhyeon-ro 34-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06296 / KR
06 / KIM, Byeong Cheol
111-104
9 Jangseungbaegi-ro 4-gil
Dongjak-gu
Seoul 06966 / KR
07 / SEO, Jin Ho
101-903
239 Bangbae-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06557 / KR
08 / HAN, Nam Soo
804-1503
56 Pungnyeon-ro
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28410 / KR
09 / HONG, Sung Jong
51-10 Nowon-ro 15-gil
Nowon-gu
Seoul 01790 / KR
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15893463.830.12.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015KR14526
Priority number, dateKR2015007220222.05.2015         Original published format: KR 20150072202
[2017/32]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016190512
Date:01.12.2016
Language:KO
[2016/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3202890
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3202890
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR01.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12R1/225, A21D13/00, A21D8/04, C12N1/18, C12N1/20, C12R1/00
[2018/09]
Former International [2017/32]C12N1/18, C12R1/225, A21D8/04, A21D13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGES INDIGENES NATÜRLICHES MILCHSÄUREBAKTERIUM ZUM BROTBACKEN AUS TRADITIONELLEM KOREANISCHEN MALZ[2017/32]
English:NOVEL INDIGENOUS NATURAL LACTOBACILLUS FOR BAKING BREAD ISOLATED FROM TRADITIONAL KOREAN MALT[2017/32]
French:NOUVEAU LACTOBACILLUS NATUREL INDIGÈNE POUR LA CUISSON DU PAIN, ISOLÉ À PARTIR DE MALT CORÉEN TRADITIONNEL[2017/32]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase07.04.2017Translation filed 
07.04.2017National basic fee paid 
07.04.2017Search fee paid 
07.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
07.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2018Fee for grant paid
18.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.02.2019
AT06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]JP3022983B  (ORIENTAL YEAST CO LTD; NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 3 - page 4; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Development of functional food materials using soybean processing by-products", (20080424), URL: http://www.google.de/url?sa=t&rct=j&q=&esrc=s&source=web&cd=4&ved=0ahUKEwjiyrX22tzYAhWHZFAKHV_TAAsQFgg-MAM&url=http%3A%2F%2Frnd.ipet.re.kr%2FipetUsr%2Fcm%2Fmdl%2Fmodule%2FfileDownload.do%3FatchFileNo%3DPMSFILE0000000000000000001055111&usg=AOvVaw3c5tir-bt4u87KU9QkVABy, (20180116), XP055441341 [A] 1-3 * table 1 *
International search[A]JP2000189041  (TAKAKI BAKERY KK) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; claims 1-3. *;
 [A]JP2003116454  (TAKAKI BAKERY KK, et al) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; claims 1-6. *;
 [A]KR20120005880  (PARIS CROISSANT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; claims 1-4. *;
 [A]KR20140022668  (MAEIL DAIRIES CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]  - RHEE, SOOK JONG et al., "Importance of Lactic Acid Bacteria in Asian Fermented Foods", Microbial Cell Factories, (20110000), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 1 - 13, XP021105392 [A] 1-3 * See the entire document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-10-S1-S5