Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3326594

EP3326594 - PRODUCTION APPARATUS FOR BIFOLDED MEMBER FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES AND PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Kinseichoshimobun
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2018/22]
Inventor(s)01 / MAITANI, Mitsuo
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / HAMADA, Akira
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2018/22]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[2019/12]
Former [2018/22]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15898945.923.07.2015
[2018/22]
WO2015JP70964
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017013786
Date:26.01.2017
Language:JA
[2017/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3326594
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3326594
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/49, A61F13/496, B65H45/22
[2018/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DOPPELFALTUNGSELEMENT FÜR SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2018/22]
English:PRODUCTION APPARATUS FOR BIFOLDED MEMBER FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES AND PRODUCTION METHOD[2018/22]
French:APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT PLIÉ EN DEUX DESTINÉ À DES ARTICLES ABSORBANTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION[2018/22]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2018Translation filed 
19.01.2018National basic fee paid 
19.01.2018Search fee paid 
19.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
19.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2019Fee for grant paid
05.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010050411  (YAMAMOTO HIROKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN104337622  (JINJIANG SHUNCHANG MACHINE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2550944  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002174930  (UMEBAYASHI TOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2010227545  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0179042 A1 & EP 2403458 B1 & CN 102341078 A *;
 [A]JP2011200385  (UNICHARM CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0059714 A1 & EP 2550944 A1 & CN 102821725 A *;
 [A]JP2013519402  (SCA Hygiene Products AB.) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0324633 A1 & EP 2536371 B1 & CN 102844001 A *;
 [A]JP2012525286  (SCA Hygiene Products AB.) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0055613 A1 & EP 2424480 B1 & CN 102458336 A *;
 [A]WO2008142946  (ZUIKO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0168708 A1 & CN 101678987 A *