Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3329743

EP3329743 - DIRECT AC DRIVING CIRCUIT AND LUMINAIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
For all designated states
Tridonic Jennersdorf GmbH
Technologiepark 10
8380 Jennersdorf / AT
[2018/23]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Quentin
3-4 Floor, A-11 building
Silicon Valley Power Industrial Park
Longhua
Baoan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
02 / BAKK, Istvan
Felsovaru. 55/C
2045 Torokbalint / HU
 [2018/23]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/23]
Application number, filing date15899316.230.07.2015
[2018/23]
WO2015CN85597
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017015964
Date:02.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3329743
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN02.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2018/43]
Former International [2018/23]H05B37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
TitleGerman:DIREKTE GLEICHSTROMTREIBERSCHALTUNG UND LEUCHTE[2018/23]
English:DIRECT AC DRIVING CIRCUIT AND LUMINAIRE[2018/23]
French:CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DIRECTEMENT EN COURANT ALTERNATIF ET LUMINAIRE[2018/23]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2018National basic fee paid 
15.01.2018Search fee paid 
15.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
15.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]CN103517497  (ANALOG INTEGRATIONS CORP) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 5 [I] 2-15;
 [Y]CN101858525  (ZHONGXUN LI) [Y] 5 * figure . *;
 [XI]WO2015050349  (MERLOT LAB INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figure - * [I] 2-15
International search[Y]CN102244955  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [Y] 1, 8-11, 17 * description paragraphs 0048-0057, Figs.4-6 *;
 [Y]CN201898641U  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [Y] 1, 8-11, 17 * description paragraphs 0048-0057, Figs.4-6 *;
 [Y]CN103517497  (ANALOG INTEGRATIONS CORP) [Y] 1, 8-11, 17 * description paragraphs 0048-0049, Figure 4 *;
 [A]CN101858525  (ZHONGXUN LI) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015050349  (MERLOT LAB INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014184077  (LEE YUN JOONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *