blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3360189

EP3360189 - PRODUCING PRESSURIZED AND HEATED FLUIDS USING A FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
1304342 Alberta Ltd
16640 - 111 Avenue NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA
For all designated states
1304338 Alberta Ltd
16640 - 111 Avenue NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA
[2018/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LOURENCO, Jose
16640 - 111 Avenue NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA
02 / MILLAR, Mackenzie
16640 - 111 Avenue NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Morbidini, Marco, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/33]
Application number, filing date15905653.004.11.2015
[2018/33]
WO2015CA51136
Priority number, dateWO2015CA5102208.10.2015         Original published format: PCT/CA2015/051022
[2018/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017059516
Date:13.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3360189
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3360189
Date:23.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA13.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:H01M8/06, H01M8/0668, E21B43/24, E21B36/00, F24H8/00, C09K8/592
[2020/22]
CPC:
E21B43/2408 (EP,KR,US); H01M8/0662 (KR); C09K8/592 (EP,US);
C09K8/594 (US); E21B36/008 (EP,KR,US); E21B43/164 (US);
E21B43/24 (US); F24H8/00 (EP,US); H01M8/04014 (US);
H01M8/04164 (US); H01M8/0668 (EP,KR,US); H01M2250/10 (US);
Y02B30/00 (EP); Y02B30/52 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/33]H01M8/06, H01M8/0668, E21B43/24, F25J1/00, C09K8/592
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN UND ERWÄRMTEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT HILFE EINER BRENNSTOFFZELLE[2018/33]
English:PRODUCING PRESSURIZED AND HEATED FLUIDS USING A FUEL CELL[2018/33]
French:PRODUCTION DE FLUIDES SOUS PRESSION ET CHAUFFÉS À L'AIDE D'UNE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE[2018/33]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2018National basic fee paid 
27.04.2018Search fee paid 
27.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
27.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2020Fee for grant paid
18.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)24.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2015
AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
MK23.09.2020
MT23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
TR23.09.2020
IE04.11.2020
LU04.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
[2022/34]
Former [2022/32]HU04.11.2015
AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
MK23.09.2020
MT23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
TR23.09.2020
IE04.11.2020
LU04.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2022/27]HU04.11.2015
AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CY23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
MT23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
TR23.09.2020
IE04.11.2020
LU04.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/48]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
IT23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
IE04.11.2020
LU04.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/46]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
IE04.11.2020
LU04.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
LU04.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SI23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
LU04.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/33]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
LU04.11.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/31]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
MC23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SK23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL23.09.2020
AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
ES23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
PL23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
IS23.01.2021
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/23]AT23.09.2020
CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
SM23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ23.09.2020
EE23.09.2020
HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RO23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/21]HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
PT25.01.2021
Former [2021/20]HR23.09.2020
LT23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
Former [2021/10]HR23.09.2020
LV23.09.2020
RS23.09.2020
SE23.09.2020
BG23.12.2020
GR24.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5232793  (MIYAUCHI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,8 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, lines 30-45 * * column 10, line 1 - column 11, line 26 *;
 [Y]WO9910945  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,5-7 * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 4 * * page 4, lines 12-15 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 26 *;
 [Y]US2012251898  (LEHAR MATTHEW ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2015106820  (HTCERAMIX SA [CH]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 5 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 4 ** claims 1,8 *
International search[Y]US5039579  (KINOSHITA NOBORU [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * Figs. 1-4, col. 6 lines 8-15, col. 3 lines 45-48, claims 4, 8, 12, 16. *;
 [Y]US5232793  (MIYAUCHI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Fig. 8 col. 10. *;
 [Y]US2004229102  (JAHNKE FRED C [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Fig. 1, Paragraphs [0003]-[0004], [0028], claim 7. *;
 [Y]US2005271914  (FAROOQUE MOHAMMAD [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Paragraphs [0035], [0023],[0026], [0027], [0031], [0035], [0018], claim 2, claim 6. *;
 [Y]US2006159967  (HUIJSMANS JOZEF P P [NL], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Paragraphs [0015], [0008], [0024], [0031], [0033], [0013], [0005], [0023], [0014]. *;
 [Y]US2010163226  (ZORNES DAVID ALLEN [US]) [Y] 1-20* Paragraphs [0070], [0074], [0075], [0066]. *;
 [Y]US2012251898  (LEHAR MATTHEW ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Figs 1-2, Paragraphs [0006], [0007], [0044]. *;
 [Y]US2014272617  (BERLOWITZ PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * Paragraphs [0209], [0266], [0057], [0066], [0150]-[0151], [0158], [0136]-[0145], [0263], [0198]-[0210]. *;
 [Y]WO2015059507  (ENERGY RES INST [SA]) [Y] 1-20 * Pages 1-2, 12 and Figure 3. *;
 [Y]  - HILL et al., "Application of molten carbonate fuel cell for CO2 capture in thermal in situ oil sands facilities", International Journal of Greenhouse Gas Control, vol. 41, (20151000), pages 276 - 284, (20150807), XP055371381 [Y] 1-20 * . (Whole document). *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijggc.2015.07.024
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.