Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3369039

EP3369039 - IDENTIFICATION OF IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ent. Services Development Corporation LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2018/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Joseph
2580 55th Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
 [2018/36]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/36]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15907442.628.10.2015
[2018/36]
WO2015US57755
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017074336
Date:04.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3369039
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/46, G06K9/32, G06K9/00
[2018/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
TitleGerman:IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON BILDERN[2018/36]
English:IDENTIFICATION OF IMAGES[2018/36]
French:IDENTIFICATION D'IMAGES[2018/36]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2018National basic fee paid 
23.05.2018Search fee paid 
23.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/36]
23.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/42]
03.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US6240208  (ARMAN GARAKANI et al.) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, claims 1-7 and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2011149115  (PO-FENG CHENG) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0013]-[0014], claim 1 and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]US2005074154  (BOGDAN GEORGESCU et al.) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraph [0073] and figures 10A-10E. *;
 [A]KR20040028658  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, claims 1-40 and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]US5850465  (KAZUO SHIMURA et al.) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, claim 1 and figure 1. *