Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229138

EP3229138 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA BACKUP IN A STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Chengwei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / YU, Chuanshuai
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Zongquan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/41]Kreuz, Georg Maria
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstrasse 8
80992 München / DE
Application number, filing date15909041.425.11.2015
[2017/41]
WO2015CN95562
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017088129
Date:01.06.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229138
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14, G06F11/20
[2018/17]
Former International [2017/41]G06F11/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENSICHERUNG IN EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM[2017/41]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA BACKUP IN A STORAGE SYSTEM[2017/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SAUVEGARDE DE DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE[2017/41]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2017Translation filed 
06.07.2017National basic fee paid 
06.07.2017Search fee paid 
06.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
06.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2014181034  (HARRISON JASON [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0017] - [0 30] , [0 31] , [0 65] - [0067] - [ 190] - [0267] - [ 299] - [0308] * * figures 1B, 6-9 *;
 [A]US7200603  (HITZ DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - line 47 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 48 - column 9, line 29 * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 6, 7 *
International search[XA]CN102014152  (INSPUR BEIJING ELECT INF IND) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0049]-[0059] description, paragraphs [0049]-[0059] * [A] 21-48;
 [X]CN1949761  (TENCENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [X] 1-20 * description, page 6, line 1 to page 9, line 2 *;
 [X]CN103744751  (ANHUI HANKE INFORMATION SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraph [0018] *;
 [X]US2014173177  (BENHASE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]CN1132372  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-48 * the whole docuement *