Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3397252

EP3397252 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2018/45]
Inventor(s)01 / REED, Jesse
72 Summer Road
Flemington New Jersey 08822 / US
02 / KOZUBAL, Cheryl
8 Angel Place
Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US
03 / HOLERCA, Nick
90 Rodney Avenue
Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date15912201.931.12.2015
[2018/45]
WO2015US68233
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017116458
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397252
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017
[2018/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/095
[2018/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
TitleGerman:KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2018/45]
English:PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS[2018/45]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS PERSONNELS[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2018National basic fee paid 
26.06.2018Search fee paid 
26.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
19.08.2019Observations by third parties
28.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2881381  (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-12,15 * tables 9,11 *;
 [X]EP1932512  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,15 * page 2, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]WO2013098066  (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,15 * page 27; table 28 * * page 24; table 20 * * page 31; table 39 * * page 1, lines 1-20 *;
 [X]DE102011078111  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * example 3 *
International search[X]US2014121268  (GUSKEY GERALD JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *;
 [A]US9187716  (GRIFFIN JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *;
 [A]US2003064091  (KINDERDINE SHERRIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *;
 [A]US2006079415  (KOZUBAL CHERYL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *