Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3054235

EP3054235 - COATING METHOD FOR METAL TANKS WITH COIL-WOUND HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ariston Thermo S.p.A.
45 Viale Aristide Merloni
60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT
[2016/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Standardi, Stefano
Ariston Thermo S.P.A.
45, Viale Aristide Merloni
I - 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
02 / Betti, Fausto
Ariston Thermo S.P.A.
45, Viale Aristide Merloni
I - 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
 [2016/32]
Representative(s)Premru, Rok
c/o Mar.Bre S.r.l.
Via San Filippo, 2
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
[2016/32]
Application number, filing date16000284.604.02.2016
[2016/32]
Priority number, dateIT2015AN0001709.02.2015         Original published format: IT AN20150017
[2016/32]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3054235
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:F24H1/18
[2016/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2016/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLBEHÄLTERN MIT SPULENGEWICKELTEM WÄRMETAUSCHER[2016/32]
English:COATING METHOD FOR METAL TANKS WITH COIL-WOUND HEAT EXCHANGER[2016/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT POUR RÉSERVOIRS MÉTALLIQUES AVEC ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À BOBINE[2016/32]
Examination procedure04.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
02.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19515425  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 9 * column 1, line 19 - line 21 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 5 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 1;
 [A]US3207358  (FLISS CARL T) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 4-5, 51-64; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE202011051419U  (FRAUENTHAL DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0042]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE1812031  (WOELLHAF FRANZ) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,11 *