Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111806

EP3111806 - THERMALLY HEATABLE AND COOLABLE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Klöber GmbH
Hauptstrasse 1
88696 Owingen / DE
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Klöck, Erwin
Schmalzbühl 5
88634 Herdwangen / DE
02 / Roth-Schuler, Christian
Zinkengasse 8
78224 Singen / DE
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date16001085.612.05.2016
[2017/01]
Priority number, dateDE2015100846101.07.2015         Original published format: DE102015008461
[2017/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111806
Date:04.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3111806
Date:30.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C7/74
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Former [2017/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:THERMISCH BEHEIZBARER UND KÜHLBARER STUHL[2017/01]
English:THERMALLY HEATABLE AND COOLABLE CHAIR[2017/01]
French:CHAISE POUVANT ETRE REFROIDIE OU CHAUFFEE THERMIQUEMENT[2017/01]
Examination procedure12.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
04.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2018Fee for grant paid
17.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
[2019/33]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011082559  (JIANG XIAOQIU [CN]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 5, line 18 - page 8, line 16; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5,7-12;
 [XY]WO2011035524  (JIANG XIAOQIU [CN]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 5,7-12;
 [XY]JP2011056173  (ITOKI CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5,7-12;
 [XY]JP2012196335  (TAKANO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-23 * [Y] 5-12;
 [XY]US2014217785  (ARENS EDWARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-12;
 [XY]KR100822451B  (MIN BYUNG YOU [KR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0103]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 5-12;
 [YD]US2010146700  (WOLAS SCOTT R [US]) [YD] 10,11 * paragraphs [0080] , [0084]; figures 1-16 *;
 [Y]US8596716  (CARUSO STEVEN JEROME [US]) [Y] 12 * page 5, line 66 - page 6, line 3 *;
 [Y]US2011220634  (YEH MING-HSIANG [TW]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0016] *;
 [Y]DE10313165  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0027]; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]US4964674  (ALTMANN DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 4 - line 39; figures 1-47 *
by applicantUS2010146700