Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3121998 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3121998



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 681
16.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
16.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
16.05.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 54
16.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
16.05.2018 Description Search / examination 52
16.05.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
23.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.12.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
05.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
05.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
14.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
14.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
14.07.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 51
14.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 56
14.07.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
30.01.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.01.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.01.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
03.01.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
07.12.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
01.09.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
09.08.2016 Description Search / examination 54
09.08.2016 Drawings Search / examination 6
09.08.2016 Previously filed application Search / examination 82
09.08.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
09.06.2016 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 82
09.06.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
08.06.2016 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Information of the Post Room regarding missing documents Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 9
08.06.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 18
08.06.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
08.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9