Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3121998


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.01.2018 First examination report published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
19.01.2018 Change - applicant published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
17.01.2018 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.12.2017 First examination report published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
19.07.2017 Amendment by applicant
12.05.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
12.05.2017 Request for examination filed published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 Change - designated states published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
23.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]