Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3121998

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure22.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted12.12.2018
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:
Countries concerned:MA MD
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20170505
 
Event date:03.01.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20171205
 
Event date:21.02.2018 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION
Owner Name:OPENCODE SYSTEMS O.O.D.
 
Event date:21.02.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20180123
 
Event date:15.08.2018 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20180720