Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3121998

EP3121998 - GENERIC MULTICHANNEL CENTER FOR NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
10, Stoil Slatinski Str.
1616 Sofia / BG
[2018/08]
Former [2017/04]For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K.Hippodruma Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
Inventor(s)01 / Staykoff, Constantin
J.K. Hippodruma
Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
 [2017/04]
Application number, filing date16001296.908.06.2016
[2017/04]
Priority number, dateUS20151473911115.06.2015         Original published format: US201514739111
[2017/04]
Previously filed application, dateUS20151473911115.06.2015
[2017/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3121998
Date:25.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3121998
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04W4/14
[2017/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
Former [2017/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GENERISCHES MEHRKANALZENTRUM FÜR NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN UND -DIENSTE[2017/04]
English:GENERIC MULTICHANNEL CENTER FOR NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES[2017/04]
French:CENTRE MULTICANAUX GENERIQUE POUR APPLICATIONS RESEAUX ET SERVICES[2017/04]
Examination procedure08.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
14.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2018Fee for grant paid
20.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011151845  (STAYKOFF CONSTANTIN [BG]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0100] * * figure 1 *
 [Y]US2015163102  (STAYKOFF CONSTANTIN [BG]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0243] - paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0301] - paragraph [0313] * * figure 7 *
 [A]US2010048228  (HARJU TEEMU [FI] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0007] * * figures 1-9 *
 [A]  - Janagoudar Sanganagouda, "USSD: A communication technology to potentially ouster SMS dependency", (20110930), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120514195521/http://www.aricent.com/sites/www.aricent.com/files/pdf/Aricent_WhitePaper_USSD_0911.pdf, (20130408), XP055058727 [A] 1-20 * page 2 - page 12 *