Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3109369

EP3109369 - SEAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Watermann Polyworks GmbH
Am Stoppelkamp 1
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Watermann, Markus
Hülsenweg 15
32760 Detmold / DE
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)Helwig, Hans-Martin , et al
Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Salierring 47-53
50677 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]Rieke, Andreas , et al
Eikel & Partner GbR
Anwaltskanzlei
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 107
32760 Detmold / DE
Application number, filing date16001419.724.06.2016
[2016/52]
Priority number, dateDE2015100809525.06.2015         Original published format: DE102015008095
[2016/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3109369
Date:28.12.2016
Language:DE
[2016/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/66, A47K3/00
[2016/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSELEMENT[2016/52]
English:SEAL ELEMENT[2016/52]
French:ÉLÉMENT D'ÉTANCHEITÉ[2016/52]
Examination procedure24.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
27.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2082674  (TRELLEBORG BUILDING SYSTEMS AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-9;
 [XI]DE20215528U  (WIRZ PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8 * page 3, line 1 - page 10, line 17; figures 1, 2 * [I] 1-9;
 [XI]DE20121477U  (WEDI STEPHAN [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 26; figures 2, 3 * [I] 1-9