Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3269739

EP3269739 - HUMANIZED ANTIBODY AGAINST O-ACETYLATED GD2 GANGLIOSIDE (OACGD2) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OGD2 Pharma
3, chemin du Pressoir Chênaie
44100 Nantes / FR
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / TERME, Mickaël
25 boulevard Vincent Gache, App B604
44200 Nantes / FR
02 / LE DOUSSAL, Jean-Marc
56 avenue Marc Dufour
1007 Lausane / CH
03 / DORVILLIUS, Mylène
17, rue Jacques Tati
44340 Bouguenais / FR
04 / ASSOULINE, Brigitte
12 rue sebastopol
92400 Courbevoie / FR
 [2018/12]
Former [2018/03]01 / TERME, Mickaël
25 boulevard Vincent Gache, App B604
44200 Nantes / FR
02 / LE DOUSSAL, Jean-Marc
56 avenue Marc Dufour
1007 Lausane / CH
03 / DORVILLIUS, Mylène
3 rue François Albert
44200 Nantes / FR
04 / ASSOULINE, Brigitte
12 rue sebastopol
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/03]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date16001564.015.07.2016
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3269739
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/30
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HUMANISIERTER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN O-ACETYLIERTES GD2-GANGLIOSID (OACGD2)[2018/03]
English:HUMANIZED ANTIBODY AGAINST O-ACETYLATED GD2 GANGLIOSIDE (OACGD2)[2018/03]
French:ANTICORPS HUMANISÉ CONTRE LE GANGLIOSIDE GD2 O-ACÉTYLÉ (OACGD2)[2018/03]
Examination procedure18.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/02]
24.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2871190  (ATLAB PHARMA [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2014177271  (ATLAB PHARMA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO2008043777  (UNIV NANTES [FR], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2014144763  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - MICKAËL TERME ET AL, "Chimeric Antibody c.8B6 to O-Acetyl-GD2 Mediates the Same Efficient Anti-Neuroblastoma Effects as Therapeutic ch14.18 Antibody to GD2 without Antibody Induced Allodynia", PLOS ONE, (20140210), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0087210, page e87210, XP055326091 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0087210
 [Y]  - NIDIA ALVAREZ-RUEDA ET AL, "A Monoclonal Antibody to O-Acetyl-GD2 Ganglioside and Not to GD2 Shows Potent Anti-Tumor Activity without Peripheral Nervous System Cross-Reactivity", PLOS ONE, (20110922), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0025220, page e25220, XP055107662 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0025220
 [Y]  - COCHONNEAU DENIS ET AL, "Cell cycle arrest and apoptosis induced byO-acetyl-GD2-specific monoclonal antibody 8B6 inhibits tumor growthin vitroand in vivo", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20130128), vol. 333, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2013.01.032, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 194 - 204, XP028581871 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2013.01.032
 [Y]  - Fleurence, "IntroductIon", Oncotarget 41172 Oncotarget, (20160705), page 27, URL: http://www.impactjournals.com/oncotarget/index.php?journal=oncotarget&page=article&op=download&path[]=9226&path[]=28362, (20161205), XP055326087 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - QI ZHAO ET AL, "Alteration of Electrostatic Surface Potential Enhances Affinity and Tumor Killing Properties of Anti-ganglioside GD2 Monoclonal Antibody hu3F8", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20150522), vol. 290, no. 21, doi:10.1074/jbc.M115.650903, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13017 - 13027, XP055326032 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M115.650903
 [Y]  - MAHIUDDIN AHMED ET AL, "In silico Driven Redesign of a Clinically Relevant Antibody for the Treatment of GD2 Positive Tumors", PLOS ONE, (20130516), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0063359, page e63359, XP055326044 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0063359
 [A]  - PARSONS KERRY ET AL, "Targeted immunotherapy for high-risk neuroblastoma--the role of monoclonal antibodies", THE ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, 1542-6270, CINCINNATI, OHIO, USA, (20130201), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1345/APH.1R353, ISSN 1542-6270, pages 210 - 218, XP008182524 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1345/aph.1R353
by applicantWO2008043777
 WO2016016343
 US5730969
 US4690915
    - LEFRANC, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212
    - CLOTHIA; LESK, JMOL BIOL., (1987), vol. L96, no. 4, pages 901 - 917
    - STANWORTH ET AL., Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1978), vol. 1
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - GILLILAND, TISSUE ANTIGENS, (1996), vol. 47, pages 1 - 20
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, AD. APP, MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMOLAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGAR, ROBERT C., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, page 1792
    - FINCO ET AL., CYTOKINE, (2014), vol. 66, pages 143 - 145