blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3282055

EP3282055 - WORK TROLLEY COMBINATION, AND METHOD FOR TREATING THE BALLAST OF A RAILWAY TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zuercher Holding GmbH
Robert-Zuercher-Strasse 1-6
77974 Meissenheim / DE
[2018/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Zürcher, Ralf
Binzenweg 12
77974 Meißenheim / DE
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)mepat Patentanwälte
Dr.Mehl-Mikus, Goy, Dr Drobnik PartGmbB
Eisenlohrstraße 31
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
[2018/07]
Application number, filing date16001755.408.08.2016
[2018/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3282055
Date:14.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:E01B27/06
[2018/07]
CPC:
E01B27/00 (EP); E01B27/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARBEITSWAGENVERBAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFARBEITUNG DER SCHOTTERBETTUNG EINES GLEISES[2018/07]
English:WORK TROLLEY COMBINATION, AND METHOD FOR TREATING THE BALLAST OF A RAILWAY TRACK[2018/07]
French:ENSEMBLE DE VEHICULES DE TRAVAIL ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE LIT DE BALLAST D'UNE VOIE FERREE[2018/07]
Examination procedure15.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
20.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP2787121  (ZUERCHER HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US4760796  (THEURER JOSEF [AT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *
by applicantEP2787121
 EP2993102
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.