Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3135343

EP3135343 - VEHICLE WITH HOSE WINDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Walter, Bruno
Rottaweg 7
6713 Ludesch / AT
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date16001809.917.08.2016
[2017/09]
Priority number, dateDE2015101140729.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015011407
[2017/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3135343
Date:01.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3135343
Date:31.07.2019
Language:DE
[2019/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A62C27/00, A62C33/02, E03B3/04
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/23]
Former [2017/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG MIT SCHLAUCHWICKELVORRICHTUNG[2017/09]
English:VEHICLE WITH HOSE WINDING DEVICE[2017/09]
French:VEHICULE COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME D'ENROULEMENT DE TUYAUX[2019/10]
Former [2017/09]VEHICULE COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME DE PLIAGE DE TUYAUX
Examination procedure17.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/23]
24.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2019Fee for grant paid
20.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2008271901  (DECKER GORDON MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0108]; figure - * [Y] 6,9;
 [Y]US5145014  (EBERHARDT H ALFRED [US]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 11 - line 22; figure - *;
 [Y]US6401829  (NEWTON RAY [US]) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 51; figure - *;
 [A]US5860479  (LAFOLLETTE DAVID A [US]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 22 - line 38; figure - *;
 [A]US5356080  (CHAPMAN JOHN A [US]) [A] 9 * abstract *
by applicantEP2756870