blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3135343 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3135343



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 191
12.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.06.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
28.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
13.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 8
15.09.2017 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
25.08.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.08.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.08.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.08.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
24.08.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
26.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.02.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.01.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
17.08.2016 Description Search / examination 14
17.08.2016 Drawings Search / examination 10
17.08.2016 Priority document Search / examination 29
17.08.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9