blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3135343


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 (Expected) grant published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
19.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.02.2019 Change - French title published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
03.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 Amendment by applicant
15.06.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
15.06.2017 Change - designated states published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
15.06.2017 Request for examination filed published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
27.01.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
25.08.2016 Change - representative