blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3135343
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3135343Global Dossier 31.07.2019B1
EP3135343 01.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102015011407 29.08.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102015011407 02.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102015011407 29.08.2015