Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3160096

EP3160096 - COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE SERVING AS TRANSMISSION CONTROL PROTOCOL (TCP) PROXY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harris Corporation
1025 West Nasa Blvd. MS A-11I
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[2017/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Weston, Jeffery H.
283 Princeton Road
Webster, NY 14580 / US
02 / Koski, Eric Norman
370 Jefferson Avenue, Apt. 16-14
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
 [2017/17]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/17]
Application number, filing date16002225.717.10.2016
[2017/17]
Priority number, dateUS20151491977322.10.2015         Original published format: US201514919773
[2017/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3160096
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3160096
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/841, H04L12/801, H04L29/06
[2017/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ALS PROXY EINES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNGSPROTOKOLLS (TCP)[2017/17]
English:COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE SERVING AS TRANSMISSION CONTROL PROTOCOL (TCP) PROXY[2017/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SERVANT DE MANDATAIRE DE PROTOCOLE DE CONTRÔLE DE TRANSMISSION (TCP)[2017/17]
Examination procedure17.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/17]
17.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2018Fee for grant paid
16.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.06.2018
AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IE17.10.2018
LU17.10.2018
MT17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL27.06.2018
AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IE17.10.2018
LU17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/48]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IE17.10.2018
LU17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/38]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
LU17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/37]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
LU17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
LU17.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005135248  (AHUJA SADHNA [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figure 4 * * figure 5; claims 6,7 *;
 [A]US2009279429  (GRIFFOUL FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - HOLZKE M ET AL, "Performance evaluation of a TCP proxy in WCDMA networks", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (20031001), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 70 - 79, XP011102957 [A] 1-10 * page 74, column 1, line 26 - page 75, column 1, line 30; figures 4,5 *