Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3329937

EP3329937 - USE OF ANTIBODY AGAINST O-ACETYLATED GD2 GANGLIOSIDE TO IMPROVE THE THERAPEUTIC POTENTIAL OF DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OGD2 Pharma
3, chemin du Pressoir Chênaie
44100 Nantes / FR
For all designated states
Université de Nantes
1, quai de Tourville
44000 Nantes / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique CNRS
3 Rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut de Cancérologie de l'Ouest (I.C.O)
15, rue André Boquel
49055 Angers Cedex 02 / FR
[2018/23]
Inventor(s)01 / BIRKLE, Stéphane
14bis rue Metzinger
44100 Nantes / FR
02 / FLEURENCE, Julien
2 impasse Pierre Teilhard de Chardin
44100 Nantes / FR
03 / FARAJ, Sébastien
14 rue de la Brasserie
44100 Nantes / FR
04 / LE DOUSSAL, Jean-Marc
56 avenue Marc Dufour
1007 Lausanne / CH
05 / COCHONNEAU, Denis
37 rue de l'Islette
44220 Coueron / FR
06 / TERME, Mickaël
25 Boulevard Vincent Gache
44200 Nantes / FR
07 / ASSOULINE, Brigitte
12 rue Sébastopol
92400 Courbevoie / FR
 [2018/23]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/23]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date16002576.305.12.2016
[2018/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3329937
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/30, // A61K39/00
[2018/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES ANTIKÖRPERS GEGEN O-ACETYLIERTES GD2-GANGLIOSID ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES THERAPEUTISCHEN POTENTIALS VON ARZNEIMITTELN[2018/23]
English:USE OF ANTIBODY AGAINST O-ACETYLATED GD2 GANGLIOSIDE TO IMPROVE THE THERAPEUTIC POTENTIAL OF DRUGS[2018/23]
French:UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS CONTRE LE GANGLIOSIDE GD2 O-ACÉTYLÉ AFIN D'AMÉLIORER LE POTENTIEL THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE MÉDICAMENTS[2018/23]
Examination procedure07.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
17.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010150910  (BIRKLE STEPHANE [FR], et al) [I] 1-19 * see § 43,48, claims *;
 [I]WO2015067375  (ATLAB PHARMA [FR], et al) [I] 1-19 * See claims *;
 [I]US2015140023  (BIRKLE STEPHANE [FR], et al) [I] 1-19 * see § 28, 43, claims *
 [X]  - AHMED MAHIUDDIN ET AL, "Engineering anti-GD2 monoclonal antibodies for cancer immunotherapy", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (201312), vol. 588, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2013.11.030, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 288 - 297, XP028669987 [X] 1-19 * See Table 1, § 2.3, § 3.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2013.11.030
by applicantEP2076542
 WO2016016343
 US5730969
    - MAHONEY ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 66, pages 1207 - 1218
    - BARATA ET AL., CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, (2016), vol. 50, pages 35 - 47
    - HIRAKI ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2015), vol. 4, page E231
    - SUN ET AL., MOL CELL BIOCHEM, (2014), vol. 390, pages L9 - 30
    - MATTHAY ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1999), vol. 341, pages 1165 - 1173
    - NAIR; JACOB, J BASIC CLIN PHARM., (2016), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 27 - 31
    - YU ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (2010), vol. 363, no. 14, pages 1324 - 1334
    - KOHLER ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2013), vol. 49, pages 3671 - 3679
    - LEFRANC ET AL., "IMGT, The International Immunogenetics Information System!", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212
    - KABAT, sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION, NO91-3242
    - CLOTHIA; LESK, J MOL BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, no. 4, pages 901 - 917
    - STANWORTH ET AL., Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1978), vol. 1
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - GILLILAND ET AL., TISSUE ANTIGENS, (1996), vol. 47, pages 1 - 20
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, AD. APP. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMOLAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGAR, ROBERT C., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, page 1792
    - WEIDLE ET AL., CANCER GENOMICS & PROTEOMICS, (2013), vol. 10, pages 1 - 18
    - CHU; LEE, Intech, MicroRNA target signatures in Advanced stage Neuroblastoma, Neuroblastoma, (2012), pages 271 - 286
    - CHOU TC, PHARMACOL REV, (2006), vol. 58, pages 621 - 681
    - ALVAREZ-RUEDA ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E25220
    - REBHAN ET AL., NEUROREPORT., (19940414), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 941 - 4
    - HETTMER ET AL., BR J CANCER, (20040719), vol. 91, no. 2, pages 389 - 397
    - CERATO ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1997), vol. 16, pages 307 - 316
    - CHOU, PHARMACOL. REV., (2006), vol. 58, no. 3, pages 621 - 81
    - LODE ET AL., J NATL CANCER INST, (1997), vol. 89, pages 1586 - 1594
    - ALVAREZ-RUEDA ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 9, page E25220