Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3009511 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3009511



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 13430
09.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 27
21.02.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.02.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.09.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.09.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
21.09.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.09.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.09.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.09.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 74
26.06.2018 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
31.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.05.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
14.03.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.02.2018 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
28.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
28.02.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
28.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
28.02.2018 Non-scannable object Opposition 184
28.02.2018 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
28.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 36
28.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 90
28.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
28.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 442
28.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 168
28.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 162
27.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
27.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
27.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 77
27.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 411
27.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 442
27.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 987
19.04.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 987
21.03.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
14.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
14.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
14.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
14.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 987
15.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 987
10.02.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
10.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Request for assignment Search / examination 10
24.01.2017 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 36
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 72
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 18
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 40
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 38
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 116
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
17.01.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 166
17.01.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 48
17.01.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 24
14.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
14.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.09.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 299
20.09.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 429
20.09.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 647
20.09.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 410
20.09.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 422
14.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.08.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.05.2016 European search report Search / examination 3
27.05.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 1059
09.05.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
23.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
07.01.2016 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1286
07.01.2016 Description Search / examination 642
07.01.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 Drawings Search / examination 340
07.01.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6