Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3032736

EP3032736 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HYBRID SOLAR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solaire 2G
Immeuble CCE
ZI Rousset Peynier
Avenue Georges Vacher
CD6
13790 Rousset / FR
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / BROTTIER, Laetitia
SOLAIRE 2G
38, Rue Frédéric Joliot-Curie
13013 Marseille / FR
02 / MOUTERDE, Jérôme
SOLAIRE 2G
38, Rue Frédéric Joliot-Curie
13013 Marseille / FR
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2017/37]
Former [2016/24]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date16150504.521.11.2011
[2016/24]
Priority number, dateFR2010005959722.11.2010         Original published format: FR 1059597
[2016/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3032736
Date:15.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3032736
Date:13.09.2017
Language:FR
[2017/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02S40/44
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
Former [2016/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES HYBRID-SOLARPANEELS[2016/24]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HYBRID SOLAR PANEL[2016/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU SOLAIRE HYBRIDE[2016/24]
Examination procedure07.01.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
15.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2017Fee for grant paid
26.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11802491.8  / EP2643856
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2011
AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
MT13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2018/52]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
MT13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
MT13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
MT13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
MT13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU21.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/41]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU21.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2911997  (DIEMUNSCH GUY [FR]) [AD] 1,3 * abstract * * page 4, line 118 - line 120 * * page 4, line 138 - line 141 * * page 6, line 194 - line 200 *;
 [A]US2008302405  (INTRIERI MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]EP0981167  (BRITISH STEEL LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] *
by applicantFR2319585
 FR2566183
 FR2727790
 US4361717
 US4184543
 US7076965
 DE19747325
 DE102004002900
 FR2911997