Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3029463

EP3029463 - DRY EYE DIAGNOSTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DiagnosTear Ltd
1 Oley Bavel St.
46344 Herzliya / IL
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / EILAT, Eran
1 Oley Bavel St.
46344 Herzliya / IL
02 / DAVID, Robert
1179 Haven Brook Court
Atlanta, GA 30319 / US
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/23]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date16151842.829.11.2012
[2016/23]
Priority number, dateUS201161564908P30.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161564908 P
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3029463
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/558, G01N33/487, A61B5/00, A61B3/10, G01N21/78, G01N21/80, A61B10/00, G01N21/84, A61B5/145
[2016/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
Former [2016/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TROCKENES-AUGE-DIAGNOSTIK[2016/23]
English:DRY EYE DIAGNOSTIC[2016/23]
French:DIAGNOSTIC DE L'OEIL SEC[2016/23]
Examination procedure19.01.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
01.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/44]
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/44]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12854447.5  / EP2786142
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008073399  (OCUSENSE INC [US]; DONSKY ERIC [US]; SULLIVAN BENJAMIN [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document, especially the abstract, paragraphs [0002], [0004], [0013], [00102], [00107], [00108], figures 6 and 15 * [Y] 1;
 [IY]EP1692999  (MARUISHI & CO LTD [JP]; QUALITAS INC [JP]) [I] 1 * the whole document, especially the abstract, paragraphs [0002], [0007], [0008], [0029]-[0033]. * [Y] 1;
 [IY]US2007140911  (CARNEY FLONA P [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * abstract, paragraphs [0004], [0008], [0011]-[0013], [0038]-[0041], [0054]-[0055] and [0066]. * [Y] 1;
 [A]US5352411  (KHURI RAJA N [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7134998
 US7129717
 US3834991
 EP0442231
 US2011252872
 US5260069
    - SCHIRMER, O., "Studien zur Physiologie und Pathologie der Tranenabsonderung and Tranenabfluss", GRAEFES ARCH CLIN EXP, OPHTHALMOL, (1903), vol. 56, pages 197 - 291
    - SCHIRMER. O., "Studien zur Physiologie und Pathologie der Tranenabsonderung und Tranenabfluss", GRAEFES ARCH CLIN EXP, OPHTHALMOL, (1903), vol. 56, pages 191 - 291
    - FARRIS, R.; STUCHELL, R. N.; MANDEL, I. D., "Tear Osmolarity Variation in the Dry Eye", TRANS. AM. OPHTHALMOL. SOC., (1986), vol. 84, pages 250 - 268
    - MACKIE, I. A.; SEAL, D. V., "Diagnostic Implications of Tear Protein Profiles", BR. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1984), vol. 68, pages 32T - 324
    - SEAL D. V.; MACKIE, I. A.; COAKES, R. L.; FAMOQI, B., "Quantitative Tear Lysozyme Assay: a New Technique for Transporting Specimens", BR. J. OPHT, (1980), vol. 64, pages 700 - 704
    - ANDRES J. KLAEGER; VICKY CEVALLOS; MARK D. SHERMAN; JOHN P. WHITCHER; RICHARD S. STEPHENS, CLINICAL APPLICATION OF A HOMOGENEOUS COLORIMETRIC ASSAY FOR TEAR LYSOZYME, (1999), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 7 - 15
    - "The challenge of dry eye diagnosis", Clinical Opththalmology, DOVE PRESS
    - ERAN EITAT, METHOD FOR QUICK ASSESSMENT OF OSMOLARITY