Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3048789

EP3048789 - DRONE PROVIDED WITH A VIDEO CAMERA AND MEANS TO COMPENSATE FOR THE ARTEFACTS PRODUCED AT THE GREATEST ROLL ANGLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Parrot Drones
174-178 quai de Jemmapes
75010 Paris / FR
[2016/36]
Former [2016/30]For all designated states
Parrot
174 quai de Jemmapes
75010 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ELINE, Pierre
68 rue Robert Schuman
95400 Arnouville Les Gonesse / FR
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5, rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/30]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique
Bardehle Pagenberg
10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date16152385.722.01.2016
[2016/30]
Priority number, dateFR2015005056826.01.2015         Original published format: FR 1550568
[2016/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3048789
Date:27.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3048789
Date:28.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232, H04N5/347, H04N5/345, A63H27/00, A63H30/04, B64C39/02
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/51]
Former [2016/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DROHNE, DIE MIT EINER VIDEOKAMERA UND MITTELN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON BILDARTEFAKTEN AUSGESTATTET IST, DIE IN DEN WICHTIGSTEN WANKWINKELBEREICHEN PRODUZIERT WERDEN[2016/30]
English:DRONE PROVIDED WITH A VIDEO CAMERA AND MEANS TO COMPENSATE FOR THE ARTEFACTS PRODUCED AT THE GREATEST ROLL ANGLES[2016/30]
French:DRONE MUNI D'UNE CAMÉRA VIDEO ET DE MOYENS DE COMPENSATION DES ARTEFACTS PRODUITS AUX ANGLES DE ROULIS LES PLUS IMPORTANTS[2016/30]
Examination procedure22.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
14.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2016Fee for grant paid
15.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2016
AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2031864  (OPT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US2011128350  (OLIVER MANUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0016] - [0040] * * figures 1-12 *;
 [A]EP2613214  (PARROT [FR]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-7 *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "The New Parrot Bebop Drone: Built for Stabilized Aerial Video | explora", (20141006), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20141006214813/http://www.bhphotovideo.com/explora/video/news/new-parrot-bebop-drone-built-stabilized-aerial-video, (20151204), XP055233862 [A] 1-3 * page 1 - page 3 *
 [A]  - GURTNER A ET AL, "Investigation of Fish-Eye Lenses for Small-UAV Aerial Photography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090301), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0196-2892, pages 709 - 721, XP011250695 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [00II] * * page 2 *
by applicantWO2010061099
 EP2364757
 EP2613213
 EP2613214
 EP2933775