EP3040685 - NAVIGATION SYSTEMS THAT ENHANCE DRIVER AWARENESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Healey, Jennifer 2131 Luz Ave. San Jose, 95116 / US | 02 /
Zafiroglu, Alexandra c/o Intel Corporation P.O. Box M/S: RNB4-140 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, OR 95054 / US | 03 /
Rosario, Barbara 2388 Vine St. Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16152774.2 | 29.12.2011 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040685 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G01C21/26, G01C21/00, G08G1/0969, B60W50/14, G08G1/0968, G08G1/0962, G08G1/0967 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/0962 (EP,US);
G01C21/3453 (US);
G01C21/34 (US);
G01C21/3415 (US);
G01C21/3691 (EP,US);
G01C21/3697 (EP,US);
G01S19/42 (US);
G08G1/096716 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
G08G1/096827 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEME MIT ERHÖHUNG DES FAHRERBEWUSSTSEINS | [2016/27] | English: | NAVIGATION SYSTEMS THAT ENHANCE DRIVER AWARENESS | [2016/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE NAVIGATION QUI AMÉLIORENT LA CONSCIENCE DE CONDUCTEUR | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2020 | 13.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/18] | 01.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11878590.6 / EP2798307 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007038370 (CHANG CHIEN-YANG [TW]) [Y] 2,3* paragraphs [0027] , [0031] *; | [XY]US2010250111 (GUTIERREZ JUAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0004] , [0033] - [0037]; figure 5 * [Y] 2,3 |