Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3051604

EP3051604 - ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, SM
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38]
17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2018 [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR
For all designated states
Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul
100-730 / KR
[2017/24]
Former [2016/31]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
For all designated states
Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul
100-730 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Myeong-Suk
c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / KIM, Sung-Wook
c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / CHO, Hwan-Hee
c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / LEE, Sang-Woo
c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / CHU, Chang-Woong
c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / KIM, Tae-Hyung
c/o Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-Ro
Jung-Gu
Seoul / KR
07 / PARK, Ho-Cheol
c/o Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-Ro
Jung-Gu
Seoul / KR
08 / LEE, Chang-Jun
c/o Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-Ro
Jung-Gu
Seoul / KR
09 / KIM, Young-Bae
c/o Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-Ro
Jung-Gu
Seoul / KR
10 / KIM, Hoe-Moon
c/o Doosan Corporation
275, Jangchungdan-Ro
Jung-Gu
Seoul / KR
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[2016/31]
Application number, filing date16153506.729.01.2016
[2016/31]
Priority number, dateKR2015001557830.01.2015         Original published format: KR 20150015578
KR2015008515116.06.2015         Original published format: KR 20150085151
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3051604
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3051604
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/54, C07C211/00
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2016/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2016/31]
English:ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE[2016/31]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE[2016/31]
Examination procedure29.01.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/11]
11.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2017Fee for grant paid
21.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2018/37]
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2365555  (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-3 *