Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3062492

EP3062492 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/14]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / MOON, Jung Nam
110-1702, Ganseok Raemian Xi Apt
860 Namdong-daero
Namdong-gu
21548 Incheon / KR
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/14]
Former [2016/35]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date16154203.004.02.2016
[2016/35]
Priority number, dateKR2015002812727.02.2015         Original published format: KR 20150028127
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3062492
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3062492
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/04, G06F1/16, H02J7/02, H02J50/00, H02J7/00, H02J50/12
[2018/37]
Former International [2016/35]H04M1/04, G06F1/16, H02J7/02, H02J50/00, H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Former [2016/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/35]
English:WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE[2016/35]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL[2016/35]
Examination procedure04.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
02.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2019Fee for grant paid
30.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.04.2019
AT03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
PL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
PL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/51]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/50]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2747236  (HANRIM POSTECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0083] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 3-6,10-13 [I] 2,7-9,14,15;
 [YA]WO2011079344  (BAUER-OEPPINGER WILLIBALD [AT]) [Y] 3,4,11-13 * page 4, line 1 - line 7 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 3 * * page 16, line 1 - line 19 * * page 17, line 7 - line 20 * * figures 17-19 * [A] 2,14,15;
 [YA]US2014373758  (PAJIC NICK [US]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0085] * * figures 3A,3B * [A] 13-15;
 [YA]US2013307470  (WATANABE TSUGUO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0165] * * figures 8A,8B, 19-22B * [A] 3,4,11,14,15