blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3064423 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3064423



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 212
27.08.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.08.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.08.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
26.01.2018 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 5
26.01.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
12.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.01.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 70
12.01.2018 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.01.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
04.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.10.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.08.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
10.08.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.08.2016 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 9
27.07.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
03.03.2016 Description Search / examination 12
03.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Priority document Search / examination 42
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
09.02.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Drawings Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 RO101 Declaration Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
09.02.2016 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 17