blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3064423


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.08.2019 First examination report
05.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2018 Change - applicant published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
23.01.2018 Change - representative
06.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2017 Amendment by applicant
17.02.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
17.02.2017 Request for examination filed published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
17.02.2017 Change - designated states published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
05.08.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
12.02.2016 Change - representative